This article lists the presidents of Burundi since the formation of the post of President of Burundi in 1966 (following the November coup d’état), to the present day.
A total of nine people has served in the office. Additionally, one person, Pierre Buyoya, served on two non-consecutive occasions.
Read: POLITICAL HISTORY OF BURUNDI
The current president of Burundi is Évariste Ndayishimiye, since 18 June 2020.
LIST OF OFFICE HOLDERS
No. | Name (Birth–Death) | Elected | Term of office | Ethnic group | Political party | Prime minister(s) | |||
Took office | Left office | Time in office | |||||||
1 | Michel Micombero (1940–1983) | — | 28 November 1966 | 1 November 1976 (deposed.) | 9 years, 339 days | Tutsi | Military / UPRONA | Nyamoya | |
2 | Jean-Baptiste Bagaza (1946–2016) | 1984 | 1 November 1976 | 3 September 1987 (deposed.) | 10 years, 306 days | Tutsi | Military / UPRONA | Nzambimana | |
3 | Pierre Buyoya (1949–2020) | — | 3 September 1987 | 10 July 1993 | 5 years, 310 days | Tutsi | Military / UPRONA | Sibomana | |
4 | Melchior Ndadaye (1953–1993) | 1993 | 10 July 1993 | 21 October 1993 (assassinated.) | 103 days | Hutu | FRODEBU | Kinigi | |
François Ngeze (born 1953) | — | 21 October 1993 | 27 October 1993 | 6 days | Hutu | Military/ UPRONA | |||
– | Sylvie Kinigi (born 1953) | — | 27 October 1993 | 5 February 1994 | 101 days | Tutsi | UPRONA | Herself | |
5 | Cyprien Ntaryamira (1955–1994) | — | 5 February 1994 | 6 April 1994 (assassinated.) | 60 days | Hutu | FRODEBU | Kinigi Kanyenkiko | |
6 | Sylvestre Ntibantunganya (born 1956) | — | 6 April 1994 | 1 October 1994 | 2 years, 110 days | Hutu | FRODEBU | Kanyenkiko Nduwayo | |
1 October 1994 | 25 July 1996 (deposed.) | ||||||||
(3) | Pierre Buyoya (1949–2020) | — | 25 July 1996 | 11 June 1998 | 6 years, 279 days | Tutsi | UPRONA | Ndimira | |
11 June 1998 | 30 April 2003 | Position abolished | |||||||
7 | Domitien Ndayizeye (born 1951) | — | 30 April 2003 | 26 August 2005 | 2 years, 118 days | Hutu | FRODEBU | ||
8 | Pierre Nkurunziza (1964–2020) | 2005 2010 2015 | 26 August 2005 | 8 June 2020 (died in office.) | 14 years, 287 days | Hutu | CNDD–FDD | ||
9 | Évariste Ndayishimiye (born 1968) | 2020 | 18 June 2020 | Incumbent | 3 years, 21 days | Hutu | CNDD–FDD | Bunyoni Ndirakobuca |