This is a list of heads of state of Burkina Faso since the Republic of Upper Volta gained independence from France in 1960 to the present day.
A total of seven people have served as head of state of Upper Volta/Burkina Faso (not counting four Transitional Heads of State/Presidents and one Acting President in rebellion).
The current head of state of Burkina Faso is Interim President Capt. Ibrahim Traoré, who took power during a coup d’état on 30 September 2022.
TERM LIMITS
As of 2021, there is a two-term limit for the president in the Constitution of Burkina Faso. The term limit has not been met by any president yet.
Read:POLITICAL HISTORY OF BURKINA FASO
TITLES
- 1960–1980: President of the Republic
- 1980–1982: President of Military Committee of Recovery for National Progress
- 1982: Chairman of Provisional Committee of Popular Salvation
- 1982–1983: Head of State
- 1983–1987: Chairman of National Revolutionary Council and Head of State
- 1987–1991: President of Popular Front and Head of State
- 1991–2014: President of the Republic
- 2015: Chairman of National Council for Democracy
- 2015–2022: President of the Republic
- 2022-present: President of the Patriotic Movement for Safeguard and Restoration
LIST OF OFFICEHOLDERS
. | Portrait | Name (Birth–Death) | Elected | Term of office | Political party | Prime minister(s) | ||
Took office | Left office | Time in office | ||||||
Republic of Upper Volta | ||||||||
1 | Maurice Yaméogo (1921–1993) | 1959 1965 | 5 August 1960 | 3 January 1966 (deposed) | 5 years, 151 days | UDV–RDA | Position not established | |
2 | Sangoulé Lamizana (1916–2005) | 1978 | 3 January 1966 | 25 November 1980 (deposed) | 14 years, 327 days | Military / Independent | Ouédraogo Himself Conombo | |
3 | Saye Zerbo (1932–2013) | — | 25 November 1980 | 7 November 1982 (deposed) | 1 year, 347 days | Military | Himself | |
4 | Jean-Baptiste Ouédraogo (born 1942) | — | 9 November 1982 | 4 August 1983 (deposed) | 268 days | Military | Sankara | |
5 | Thomas Sankara (1949–1987) | — | 4 August 1983 | 4 August 1984 | 1 year | Military | Position abolished | |
Burkina Faso | ||||||||
(5) | Thomas Sankara (1949–1987) | — | 4 August 1984 | 15 October 1987 (assassinated) | 3 years, 72 days | Military | Position abolished | |
6 | Blaise Compaoré (born 1951) | 1991 1998 2005 2010 | 15 October 1987 | 31 October 2014 (resigned) | 27 years, 16 days | Military/ FP ODP–MT / CDP | Y. Ouédraogo Kaboré K. D. Ouédraogo Yonli Zongo Tiao | |
– | Honoré Traoré (born 1957) claimant | — | 31 October 2014 | 1 November 2014 | 1 day | Military | Position vacant | |
– | Yacouba Isaac Zida (born 1965) | — | 1 November 2014 | 18 November 2014 | 17 days | Military (RSP) | Position vacant | |
– | Michel Kafando (born 1942) | — | 18 November 2014 | 17 September 2015 (deposed) | 303 days | Independent | Zida | |
– | Gilbert Diendéré (born c. 1960) | — | 17 September 2015 | 23 September 2015 (junta dissolved) | 6 days | Military (RSP) | Position vacant | |
– | Chérif Sy (born 1960) | — | 17 September 2015 | 23 September 2015 | 6 days | Independent | Position vacant | |
– | Michel Kafando (born 1942) | — | 23 September 2015 (restored) | 29 December 2015 | 97 days | Independent | Zida | |
7 | Roch Marc Christian Kaboré (born 1957) | 2015 2020 | 29 December 2015 | 24 January 2022 (deposed) | 6 years, 26 days | MPP | Thieba Dabiré L. Zerbo | |
– | Paul-Henri Sandaogo Damiba (born 1981) | – | 24 January 2022 | 30 September 2022 (deposed) | 249 days | Military | Ouédraogo | |
– | Ibrahim Traoré (born 1988) | – | 30 September 2022 | Incumbent | 252 days | Military | Tambèla |