| | Name (Birth–Death) | Title | Term of office | Political party |
| | Took office | Left office | Time in office |
/ • State of the Comoros (État Comorien) |
1 | | Ahmed Abdallah (1919–1989) | President of the Government (until 7 July 1975) Head of State | 6 July 1975 | 3 August 1975 | 28 days | UDC |
2 | | Said Mohamed Jaffar (1918–1993) | Chairman of the National Council of the Revolution (until 10 August 1975) Chairman of the National Executive Council | 3 August 1975 | 3 January 1976 | 153 days | RDPC |
3 | | Ali Soilih (1937–1978) | Head of State (until 28 October 1977) President | 3 January 1976 | 13 May 1978 | 2 years, 130 days | RDPC |
4 | | Said Atthoumani | Chairman of the Politico-Military Directorate | 13 May 1978 | 23 May 1978 | 10 days | Independent |
// • Federal and Islamic Republic of the Comoros (République fédérale islamique des Comores) (Jumhuriyat al-Qumur al-Itthadiyah al-Islamiyah) |
– | | Ahmed Abdallah & Mohamed (1919–1989) (1917–1984) | Co-Chairmen of the Politico-Military Directorate (until 22 July 1978) Co-Chairmen of the Directorate | 23 May 1978 | 3 October 1978 | 133 days | UDC |
(1) | | Ahmed Abdallah (1919–1989) | Chairman of the Directorate (until 25 October 1978) President | 3 October 1978 | 26 November 1989 † | 11 years, 54 days | UDC |
– | | Said Mohamed Djohar (1919–2006) Acting | Acting President | 27 November 1989 | 20 March 1990 | 113 days | UDC |
5 | | Said Mohamed Djohar (1919–2006) | President | 20 March 1990 | 29 September 1995 | 5 years, 193 days | UCP |
6 | | Combo Ayouba (c. 1952–2010) | Coordinator of the Transitional Military Committee | 29 September 1995 | 2 October 1995 | 3 days | Military |
– | | Mohamed Taki Abdoulkarim & said Ali Kemal Acting (1936–1998) (1938–2020) | Acting President | 2 October 1995 | 5 October 1995 | 3 days | National Union for Democracy (Comoros) Party of Unity and Fraternity of the Islands |
– | | Caabi El-Yachroutu Mohamed (born 1949) Acting | Interim President | 5 October 1995 | 26 January 1996 | 113 days | Rally for Democracy and Renewal |
(5) | | Said Mohamed Djohar (1919–2006) | President | 26 January 1996 | 25 March 1996 | 59 days | Rally for Democracy and Renewal |
6 | | Mohamed Taki Abdoulkarim (1936–1998) | President | 25 March 1996 | 6 November 1998 † | 2 years, 226 days | Rally for Democracy and Renewal |
– | | Tadjidine Massounde (1933–2004) Acting | Interim President | 6 November 1998 | 30 April 1999 | 175 days | Independent |
7 | | Colonel Azali Asso (born 1959) | Chief of Staff of the National Development Army (until 6 May 1999) Head of State | 30 April 1999 | 23 December 2001 | 2 years, 237 days | Military |
• Union of the Comoros (Union des Comores) / الاتحاد القمر (dzima wa Komori) |
(7) | | Colonel Azali Assoumani (born 1959) | Head of State | 23 December 2001 | 21 January 2002 | 29 days | Military |
– | | Hamada Madi (born 1965) Acting
| Interim President | 21 January 2002 | 26 May 2002 | 125 days | Republican Party (Comoros) |
7 | | Azali Assoumani (born 1959) | President | 26 May 2002 | 26 May 2006 | 4 years | CRC |
8 | | Ahmed Sambi (born 1958) | President | 26 May 2006 | 26 May 2011 | 5 years | FNJ |
9 | | Ikililou Dhoinine (born 1962) | President | 26 May 2011 | 26 May 2016 | 5 years | FNJ |
7 | | Azali Assoumani (born 1959) | President | 26 May 2016 | Incumbent | 7 years, 95 days | CRC |
– | | Moustadroine Abdou (born 1969) Acting | Interim President | 13 February 2019 | 3 April 2019 | 49 days | CRC |
| | | | | | | | |